Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Dodoma

Archidioecesis Dodomaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Beatus Kinyaiya, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop
  • Matthias Joseph Isuja, Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 6 November 2014
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 38,743 (14,964 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 922, Dodoma, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (026)239.4462
  • Fax: 239.5513

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Dodoma
28 January 1935ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Dodoma (erected)
14 April 1943Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Dodoma
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Mbulu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Dodoma
10 May 1951ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Dodoma Vicariate Apostolic of Dodoma
Diocese of Dodoma
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Dodoma Diocese of Dodoma
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Dodoma
Diocese of Mbeya
Diocese of Mbulu
Archdiocese of Tabora
Diocese of Singida (erected)
12 March 2011Territory LostDiocese of Dodoma Diocese of Kondoa (erected)
Archdiocese of Dodoma
6 November 2014ElevatedDiocese of Dodoma Archdiocese of Dodoma

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Dodoma
195029,710600,0005.0%227291,02430ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Dodoma
Diocese of Dodoma
1969110,000600,00018.3%1047571,9295817518ap1971
1980142,625973,33514.7%1649652,19415924927ap1981
1990194,3501,541,76712.6%2749762,5576333334ap1991
1999257,8471,850,00013.9%4640862,9988340539ap2000
2000269,2791,850,00014.6%5137883,05911442542ap2001
2001285,3501,850,00015.4%5445992,88211144745ap2002
2002302,2451,850,00016.3%6137983,08413044848ap2003
2003318,5071,698,99618.7%62421043,06213041348ap2004
2004326,1271,698,99619.2%59411003,26110942249ap2005
2006381,4791,831,00020.8%5930894,28610345636ap2007
2011294,2671,657,34517.8%5532873,3823641430bul:12mar2011
2013301,5931,578,17319.1%4139803,7699230532ap2014
Archdiocese of Dodoma

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014