Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agapiti Ndorobo

Bishop of Mahenge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1954 BornKidulo
6 Dec 198026.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 199540.6AppointedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania
16 Jun 199540.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Agapiti Ndorobo:
Bishop Agapiti Ndorobo (born ) Bishop of Mahenge

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mahenge.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013