Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Telesphore Mkude

Bishop of Morogoro, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1945 Born
16 Jul 197226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Morogoro, Tanzania
18 Jan 198842.1AppointedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
26 Apr 198842.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
5 Apr 199347.3AppointedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Telesphore Mkude
Bishop Telesphore Mkude (born ) Bishop of Morogoro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinde

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morogoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,718
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast