Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurus Gervase Komba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1923Born
15 Jul 195431.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 196946.9AppointedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
15 Mar 197047.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
18 Jan 198865.0ResignedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
23 Feb 199673.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Maurus Gervase Komba
Bishop Maurus Gervase Komba (born 1923, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLitembo

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast