Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugéne Cornelius Arthurs, I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1914BornKeady, Ireland
23 Mar 194328.9Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Charity
9 Jun 195036.1AppointedPrefect of Tanga, Tanzania
7 May 195844.0AppointedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
24 Aug 195844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
15 Dec 196955.6ResignedBishop of Tanga, Tanzania
15 Dec 196955.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
10 Aug 197662.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
23 Feb 197863.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Eugéne Cornelius Arthurs:
Bishop Eugéne Cornelius Arthurs I.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tanga

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015