Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene O’Doherty

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dromore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1896BornGlencrow, Moville
19 Jun 192125.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 194448.1AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
28 May 194448.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
22 Nov 197579.7RetiredBishop of Dromore, Ireland
24 Mar 197983.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Eugene O’Doherty:
Bishop Eugene O’Doherty (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dromore

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015