Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph MacNamee

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1876BornFintona
17 Jun 190023.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 192750.5AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
31 Jul 192750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
24 Apr 196689.4DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Joseph MacNamee:
Bishop James Joseph MacNamee (born , died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013