Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Moynagh, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calabar, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1903Born
22 Jun 193027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
1932²28.6EnteredPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
26 Oct 193431.5AppointedPrefect of Calabar, Nigeria
12 Jun 194744.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
12 Jun 194744.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Calabar, Nigeria
7 Sep 194744.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
18 Apr 195046.9AppointedBishop of Calabar, Nigeria
5 Feb 197066.7ResignedBishop of Calabar, Nigeria
5 Feb 197066.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mageó
11 Dec 197067.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Mageó
11 Jun 198582.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Calabar, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Moynagh (VIAF: 313487733)
Bishop James Moynagh S.P.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calabar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoughduff, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick's, College, Maynooth

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 89
  • opd/ente: CB, 22 Jun 2017
  • c1: CB, 23 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017