Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Brian David Usanga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Calabar, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1928Born
8 Dec 195628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Calabar, Nigeria
5 Aug 196637.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calabar, Nigeria
5 Aug 196637.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaba
4 Dec 196638.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaba
5 Feb 197041.2AppointedBishop of Calabar, Nigeria
26 May 199465.5AppointedArchbishop of Calabar, Nigeria
17 Dec 200375.1RetiredArchbishop of Calabar, Nigeria
26 May 200576.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Calabar, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Brian David Usanga
Archbishop Brian David Usanga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Calabar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObotim

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018