Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Bellotti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Finland

Titular Archbishop of Voncariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1914Born
11 Jul 193723.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 196450.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Voncariana
18 Jul 196450.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Central-Western Africa
4 Oct 196450.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Voncariana
27 Nov 196955.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Uganda
2 Sep 197561.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
27 Oct 198167.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Finland
27 Oct 198167.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iceland
27 Oct 198167.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Scandinavia
2 Oct 198268.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Denmark
2 Oct 198268.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Norway
2 Oct 198268.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sweden
Oct 1985³71.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Finland
Oct 1985³71.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iceland
Oct 1985³71.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Denmark
Oct 1985³71.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Norway
Oct 1985³71.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sweden
23 Sep 199581.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Finland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bellotti
Archbishop Luigi Bellotti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Finland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Death PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 73, Page 685
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 74, Page 1,197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1964, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022