Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Lenotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Foggia, Italy

Bishop of Bovino

Bishop of Troia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1907Born
12 Jul 193123.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 196052.7AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
23 Oct 196052.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
18 Apr 196254.3AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
14 Dec 197467.0AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
14 Dec 197467.0AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
30 Apr 197971.4AppointedArchbishop of Foggia, Italy
28 Jan 198173.1DiedArchbishop of Foggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Lenotti
Archbishop Giuseppe Lenotti (born , died ) Archbishop of Foggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Zeno di Montagna

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018