Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Paciello

Bishop Emeritus of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1937 BornBarcellona Pozzo di Gotto
30 Jun 196325.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 199153.7AppointedBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
29 Sep 199153.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
6 Aug 199759.8AppointedBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
15 Oct 201376.0RetiredBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Paciello:
Bishop Mario Paciello (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,608
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013