Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Leonardo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1915BornPietramelara
24 Jul 193823.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 195742.3AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
29 Sep 195742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
21 Mar 198469.0AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
30 Sep 198671.5AppointedBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
20 Jul 199176.3RetiredBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
15 Apr 2015100.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Leonardo:
Bishop Felice Leonardo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 76.7 years
  • a bishop for 57.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 16 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015