Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Castoro

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1952Born
6 Aug 197725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
14 May 200553.3AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
25 Jun 200553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
29 Aug 200553.6InstalledBishop of Oria, Italy
15 Jul 200957.5AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
19 Sep 200957.6InstalledArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
5 May 201866.3DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Castoro
Archbishop Michele Castoro (born , died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura, Territorial Prelature of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti
Ordained PriestCathedral, Altamura, Territorial Prelature of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti
Ordained BishopCathedral, Altamura, Diocese of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti
Death PlaceHospital, San Giovanni Rotondo, Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,904
  • d: CB, 5 May 2018
  • c1/i: AM, 6 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast