Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Isgró

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1930Born
29 Jun 195322.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 197544.5AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
25 Apr 197544.5AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
21 Jun 197544.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
8 Apr 197847.4AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
18 Mar 198251.4AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
2 May 200473.5DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Isgró
Archbishop Salvatore Isgró (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcellona Pozzo di Gotto

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast