Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Pisanello

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1959 Born
23 Jun 198425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Otranto, Italy
23 Jan 201050.7AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
8 Apr 201050.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
24 Apr 201050.9InstalledBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Pisanello
Bishop Vincenzo Pisanello (born ) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalatina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,617

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018