Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gianfranco Gallone

Apostolic Nuncio to Zambia

Titular Archbishop of Motula

Apostolic Nuncio to Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1963 Born
3 Sep 198825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oria, Italy
2 Feb 201955.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zambia
2 Feb 201955.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Motula
19 Mar 201955.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Motula
8 May 201956.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malawi

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco Gallone
Archbishop Gianfranco Gallone (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Zambia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeglie Messapica, Diocese of Oria, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Zambia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 2 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,118
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 May 2019

Quantcast