Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Parolin

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Simone e Giuda Taddeo a Torre Angela

Member of the Council of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1955 BornSchiavon, Italy
27 Apr 198025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
17 Aug 200954.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
17 Aug 200954.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquipendium
12 Sep 200954.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aquipendium
15 Oct 201358.7AppointedSecretary of State
22 Feb 201459.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201459.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Simone e Giuda Taddeo a Torre Angela
2 Jul 201459.4AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals
11 Oct 201459.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Simone e Giuda Taddeo a Torre Angela

MicroData Summary for Pietro Parolin:
Pietro Cardinal Parolin (born ) Secretary of State

Please contact the Cardinal through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,275
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2013
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015