Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tymon Tytus Chmielecki

Apostolic Nuncio to Guinea

Titular Archbishop of Tres Tabernae

Apostolic Nuncio to Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1965 Born
26 May 199125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 Mar 199226.3IncardinatedPriest of Toruń, Poland
26 Mar 201953.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
26 Mar 201953.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali
26 Mar 201953.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tres Tabernae
13 May 201953.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tres Tabernae

MicroData Summary for Tymon Tytus Chmielecki (VIAF: 161231945)
Archbishop Tymon Tytus Chmielecki (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Guinea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToruń
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Guinea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2019
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast