Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Wojciech Suski

Bishop Emeritus of Toruń, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1941 Born
13 Jun 196523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
12 Aug 198644.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
12 Aug 198644.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
4 Oct 198644.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
25 Mar 199250.2AppointedBishop of Toruń, Poland
11 Nov 201775.8RetiredBishop of Toruń, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Wojciech Suski (VIAF: 164031989)
Bishop Andrzej Wojciech Suski (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Toruń

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlock

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toruń.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018