Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Szamocki

Auxiliary Bishop of Toruń

Titular Bishop of Clypia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1954 BornGdynia
29 Apr 197924.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 200045.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toruń, Poland
20 Apr 200045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Clypia
27 May 200045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clypia

MicroData Summary for Józef Szamocki:
Bishop Józef Szamocki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toruń

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toruń.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,774

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013