Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zygmunt Kamiński

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1933Born
22 Dec 195623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
28 Oct 197542.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
28 Oct 197542.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Midica
30 Nov 197542.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midica
10 Jan 198450.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
4 Feb 198854.9SucceededBishop of Płock, Poland
1 May 199966.1AppointedArchbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
21 Feb 200975.9RetiredArchbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
1 May 201077.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Kamiński (VIAF: 101581400)
Archbishop Zygmunt Kamiński (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWzgórze-Belzyce

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2009
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Nov 2017