Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roman Adam Marcinkowski

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Bulla Regia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1942 Born
13 Jun 196523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
23 Feb 198542.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
23 Feb 198542.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulla Regia
13 Apr 198543.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulla Regia
13 Apr 201775.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Roman Adam Marcinkowski (VIAF: 101735309)
Bishop Roman Adam Marcinkowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzczutowo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Płock.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Apr 2017