Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Gurda

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

Titular Bishop of Thasbalta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1920BornKsiaznice Wielkie
2 Apr 194929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
7 Jan 197251.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
7 Jan 197251.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
13 Feb 197251.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
16 Jan 199372.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Gurda:
Bishop Jan Gurda (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013