Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Jaroszewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Kielce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1903Born
11 Oct 192522.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 195754.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
10 Dec 195754.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Letopolis
11 Feb 195854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Letopolis
20 Mar 196763.8AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
17 Apr 198076.8DiedBishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Jaroszewicz
Bishop Jan Jaroszewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMitawa
Ordained BishopKielce, Diocese of Kielce

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 709
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,009, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 5 Aug 2020

Quantcast