Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Gurda

Bishop of Siedlce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1953 BornKsiaznice Wielkie
11 Jun 197824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
18 Dec 200451.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
18 Dec 200451.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
5 Feb 200551.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira
16 Apr 201460.7AppointedBishop of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Gurda:
Bishop Kazimierz Gurda (born ) Bishop of Siedlce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Siedlce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,821
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014