Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Ryczan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kielce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1939Born
16 Jun 196324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Jul 199354.4AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
11 Sep 199354.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kielce, Poland
11 Oct 201475.6RetiredBishop of Kielce, Poland
13 Sep 201778.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Ryczan (VIAF: 102304108)
Bishop Kazimierz Ryczan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŻurawica, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained PriestAssumption of Mary and St. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Przemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained BishopAssumption of Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Kielce, Diocese of Kielce
Death PlaceŚwiģtokrzyskim Centrum Onkologii, Kielce, Diocese of Kielce

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,170
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018