Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Barda

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1880BornMszana Dolna
26 Jul 190423.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 193150.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
10 Jul 193150.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
30 Aug 193151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
25 Nov 193353.2AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
13 Nov 196484.2DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Barda:
Bishop Franciszek Barda (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015