Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Boguslaw Błaszkiewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Bisuldino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1916BornPrzemysl
19 Jun 194932.7Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
6 Jun 197053.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
6 Jun 197053.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisuldino
29 Jun 197053.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisuldino
7 Jun 199376.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Boguslaw Błaszkiewicz
Bishop Tadeusz Boguslaw Błaszkiewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Feb 2016