Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Nowicki

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lviv

Titular Bishop of Pupiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1894BornKolomyja
29 May 191924.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 196873.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv, Ukraine
23 Mar 196873.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
2 Jun 196873.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
14 Aug 197378.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Nowicki:
Bishop Jan Nowicki (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lviv

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013