Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacy Marcin Tokarczuk

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1918BornLubianki
21 Jun 194224.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 196547.8AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
6 Feb 196648.0Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Jun 199173.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Mar 199274.1AppointedArchbishop of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Apr 199375.2RetiredArchbishop of Przemyśl, Poland
29 Dec 201294.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Marcin Tokarczuk:
Archbishop Ignacy Marcin Tokarczuk (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013