Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wacław Józef Świerzawski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1927Born
11 Dec 194922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
3 Jun 199164.0IncardinatedPriest of Lubaczów, Poland
25 Mar 199264.8AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
28 Apr 199264.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
7 Oct 200275.3RetiredBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
7 Oct 201790.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wacław Józef Świerzawski (VIAF: 69348679)
Bishop Wacław Józef Świerzawski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZłoczew, Archdiocese of Lviv, Ukraine
Ordained PriestOur Lady of Angels, Basilica, Kalwaria Zebrzydowska, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Sandomierz, Diocese of Sandomierz
Death PlaceSandomierz, Diocese of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,976
  • opd: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast