Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrzej Dzięga

Archbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1952 Born
11 Jun 197724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Siedlce, Poland
7 Oct 200249.8AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
24 Nov 200249.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
21 Feb 200956.1AppointedArchbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
4 Apr 200956.3InstalledArchbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Dzięga (VIAF: 101724520)
Archbishop Andrzej Dzięga (born ) Archbishop of Szczecin-Kamień

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadzyn Podlaski

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Szczecin-Kamień.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017