Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Artur Grzegorz Miziński

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tarasa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1965 Born
23 Mar 198924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
3 May 200439.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
3 May 200439.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Numidia
30 May 200439.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Artur Grzegorz Miziński (VIAF: 249935597)
Bishop Artur Grzegorz Miziński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOpole Lubelskie
Ordained BishopSt Jean Baptiste et St Jean Evangéliste, Cathedral, Lublin, Archdiocese of Lublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,603

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast