Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boleslaw Pylak

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lublin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1921Born
29 Jun 194826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
14 Mar 196644.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
14 Mar 196644.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Midica
29 May 196644.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midica
27 Jun 197553.8AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
25 Mar 199270.5AppointedArchbishop of Lublin, Poland
14 Jun 199775.8RetiredArchbishop of Lublin, Poland
6 Jun 201997.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Boleslaw Pylak
Archbishop Boleslaw Pylak (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLopiennik Górny
Death PlaceLublin, Archdiocese of Lublin

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast