Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Ilcewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1924Born
29 Jun 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 196945.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
14 Apr 196945.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Trevico
15 May 196945.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trevico
12 Sep 198157.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edmund Ilcewicz
Bishop Edmund Ilcewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrodno

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast