Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Sobiło

Auxiliary Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Bulna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1962 Born
13 Dec 198624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
25 Mar 199229.8IncardinatedPriest of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland
30 Oct 201048.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
30 Oct 201048.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulna
8 Dec 201048.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulna

MicroData Summary for Jan Sobiło
Bishop Jan Sobiło (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNisko, Poland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kharkiv, Diocese of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,871
  • opd: CB, 17 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast