Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Śrutwa

Bishop Emeritus of Zamość-Lubaczów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1940 BornMajdan Górny
31 May 196423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
25 Jul 198443.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
25 Jul 198443.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Liberalia
1 Sep 198443.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Liberalia
25 Mar 199251.3AppointedBishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland
5 Aug 200665.7ResignedBishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Śrutwa:
Bishop Jan Śrutwa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamość-Lubaczów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamość-Lubaczów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013