Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wacław Tomasz Depo

Archbishop of Częstochowa, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1953 Born
3 Jun 197824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz, Poland
25 Mar 199238.4IncardinatedPriest of Radom, Poland
5 Aug 200652.8AppointedBishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland
9 Sep 200652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zamość-Lubaczów, Poland
29 Dec 201158.2AppointedArchbishop of Częstochowa, Poland
2 Feb 201258.3InstalledArchbishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wacław Tomasz Depo (VIAF: 161435665)
Archbishop Wacław Tomasz Depo (born ) Archbishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzydłowiec, Diocese of Sandomierz
Ordained PriestNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Sandomierz, Diocese of Sandomierz
Ordained BishopResurrection and St. Thomas Apostle, Cathedral, Zamość, Diocese of Zamość-Lubaczów

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Częstochowa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,241
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast