Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Wojciech Turzyński

Auxiliary Bishop of Radom, Poland

Titular Bishop of Usula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1964 Born
28 May 198823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz-Radom, Poland
25 Mar 199227.4IncardinatedPriest of Radom, Poland
17 Jan 201550.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Radom, Poland
17 Jan 201550.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
28 Feb 201550.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula

MicroData Summary for Piotr Wojciech Turzyński
Bishop Piotr Wojciech Turzyński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Radom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadom

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Radom.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2015
  • mn/c1: CB, 17 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast