Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Marian Tomasik

Bishop of Radom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1946 BornLuków
31 May 196923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Siedlce, Poland
21 Nov 199246.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland
21 Nov 199246.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
6 Jan 199347.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
16 Oct 200963.8AppointedBishop of Radom, Poland
14 Nov 200963.9InstalledBishop of Radom, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Marian Tomasik:
Bishop Henryk Marian Tomasik (born ) Bishop of Radom

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Radom.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,940
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013