Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Henryk Sawczuk

Auxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland

Titular Bishop of Ottana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1962 Born
6 Jun 198725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Siedlce, Poland
19 Jan 201350.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland
19 Jan 201350.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ottana
6 Apr 201351.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ottana

MicroData Summary for Piotr Henryk Sawczuk
Bishop Piotr Henryk Sawczuk (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuczyce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Siedlce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast