Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Golebiowski

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Sandomierz

Titular Bishop of Panium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1902BornJedlinsk
12 Oct 192422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz, Poland
3 Jun 195754.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
3 Jun 195754.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Panium
28 Jul 195755.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panium
20 Feb 196865.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sandomierz, Poland
2 Nov 198078.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Golebiowski:
Bishop Piotr Golebiowski (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015