Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kanty Lorek, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1886Born
2 Jul 191124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
26 Apr 193649.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
26 Apr 193649.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
7 Jun 193649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modra
12 Mar 194659.3AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
4 Jan 196780.2DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Kanty Lorek
Bishop Jan Kanty Lorek C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlazejowice

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 39
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 621, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 694, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast