Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Siczek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Radom

Titular Bishop of Dagnum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1937BornSiczki
27 May 196123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Radom, Poland
25 Mar 199254.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Radom, Poland
25 Mar 199254.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dagnum
11 Apr 199254.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dagnum
31 Jul 201274.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Radom, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Siczek:
Bishop Stefan Siczek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Radom

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,974
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013