Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Nowak

Archbishop Emeritus of Częstochowa, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1935 Born
22 Jun 195822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
26 Oct 198449.2AppointedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
25 Nov 198449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
25 Mar 199256.7AppointedArchbishop of Częstochowa, Poland
29 Dec 201176.4RetiredArchbishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Nowak (VIAF: 101968125)
Archbishop Stanisław Nowak (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJeziorzany, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained PriestSaints Stanislaus and Wenceslaus, Cathedral Basilica, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Częstochowa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast