Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Olszanski, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1919BornBrody
15 Nov 194223.8Ordained PriestPriest
1988²68.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
16 Jan 199172.0AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
2 Mar 199172.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
4 May 200283.3RetiredBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
23 Feb 200384.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Olszanski:
Bishop Jan Olszanski M.I.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,393
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,757
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • inca: CB, 2 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 3 Feb 2015