Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bronisław Bernacki

Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1944 BornMurafa
28 May 197227.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 200257.6AppointedBishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine
4 Jul 200257.8Ordained BishopBishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Bronisław Bernacki:
Bishop Bronisław Bernacki (born ) Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Odessa-Simferopol.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013