Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vitaliy Krivitskiy, S.D.B.

Bishop-Elect of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1972 Born
1 Jan 199118.3First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jul 199623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jul 199623.9Perpetual VowsDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 May 199724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Apr 201744.6AppointedBishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine
24 Jun 201744.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vitaliy Krivitskiy
Father Vitaliy Krivitskiy S.D.B. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Kyiv-Zhytomyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOdessa
Ordained BishopSt. Alexander, Kyiv, Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2017
  • sole: CB, 1 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 16 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017