Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claudio Gugerotti

Apostolic Nuncio to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Rebellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1955 Born
29 May 198226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
7 Dec 200146.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rebellum
7 Dec 200146.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Georgia
7 Dec 200146.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Armenia
13 Dec 200146.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Azerbaijan
6 Jan 200246.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rebellum
15 Jul 201155.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belarus
13 Nov 201560.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ukraine
4 Jul 202064.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Gugerotti
Archbishop Claudio Gugerotti (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Great Britain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Great Britain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,095
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Sep 2020

Quantcast